Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Władisław Blin

Bishop Emeritus of Vitebsk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1954 BornSwidwin
25 May 198026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
13 Oct 199945.4AppointedBishop of Vitebsk, Belarus
20 Nov 199945.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vitebsk, Belarus
25 Feb 201358.7ResignedBishop of Vitebsk, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Władisław Blin:
Bishop Władisław Blin (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Vitebsk

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vitebsk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,648
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013