Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleh Butkevich

Bishop of Vitebsk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1972 BornBraslau
13 May 200028.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vitebsk, Belarus
29 Nov 201341.7AppointedBishop of Vitebsk, Belarus
18 Jan 201441.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vitebsk, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Aleh Butkevich:
Bishop Aleh Butkevich (born ) Bishop of Vitebsk

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vitebsk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Nov 2013
  • ob: CB, 29 Nov 2013
  • c2+: CB, 13 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 13 Jan 2014