Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael William Warfel

Bishop of Great Falls-Billings, Montana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1948 Born
26 Apr 198031.6Ordained PriestPriest of Anchorage, Alaska, USA
19 Nov 199648.1AppointedBishop of Juneau, Alaska, USA
17 Dec 199648.2Ordained BishopBishop of Juneau, Alaska, USA
23 Oct 200153.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
7 Jun 200253.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Fairbanks, Alaska, USA
20 Nov 200759.1AppointedBishop of Great Falls-Billings, Montana, USA
16 Jan 200859.3InstalledBishop of Great Falls-Billings, Montana, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael William Warfel
Bishop Michael William Warfel (born ) Bishop of Great Falls-Billings

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElkhart, IN

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Great Falls-Billings.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,871

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast