Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Łukasz Mirosław Buzun, O.S.P.P.E.

Auxiliary Bishop of Kalisz

Titular Bishop of Chusira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1968 BornKorycin
2 Aug 199527.4Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
3 Aug 199527.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
8 Jun 199628.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
5 Jul 201446.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalisz, Poland
5 Jul 201446.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Chusira
16 Aug 201446.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chusira

MicroData Summary for Łukasz Mirosław Buzun:
Bishop Łukasz Mirosław Buzun O.S.P.P.E. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kalisz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kalisz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jul 2014
  • od/c01/ob: CB, 5 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 Jul 2014