Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
25 Jan 1972 | Born | ||
22 Aug 1998 | 26.5 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Barranquilla, Colombia |
15 May 2024 | 52.3 | Appointed | Bishop of El Banco, Colombia |
27 Jul 2024 | 52.5 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of El Banco, Colombia |
10 Aug 2024 | 52.5 | Installed | Bishop of El Banco, Colombia |
(WikiData: Q125937127)
Father
Dimas Antonio
Acuña Jiménez
(born )
Bishop-Elect
of El Banco
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Usiacurí, Archdiocese of Barranquilla |
Ordained Bishop | Maria Reina, Cathedral, Barranquilla, Archdiocese of Barranquilla |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 25 May 2024 |
✠