Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johannes Petrus Huibers

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Haarlem, Netherlands

Titular Archbishop of Cypsela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1875Born
15 Aug 189923.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 193560.0AppointedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
11 Feb 193660.2Ordained BishopBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
27 Jun 196084.6RetiredBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
27 Jun 196084.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cypsela
20 Apr 196993.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Haarlem, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johannes Petrus Huibers
Archbishop Johannes Petrus Huibers (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Haarlem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmsterdam

  • a priest for 69.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 1 Nov 2017