Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Stam, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kisumu

Titular Bishop of Cediae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1876BornWeesp, Netherlands
9 Mar 193659.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kisumu, Kenya
9 Mar 193659.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cediae
28 Jun 193659.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cediae
9 Apr 194871.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Kisumu, Kenya
26 May 194972.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kisumu, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Stam:
Bishop Nicolas Stam M.H.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kisumu

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1950
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013