Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Henri Romeijn, M.S.F. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Samarinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1906BornVoorschoten
24 Jul 193226.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
10 Jul 195549.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Samarinda, Indonesia
10 Jul 195549.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria
15 Sep 195549.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria
3 Jan 196154.8AppointedBishop of Samarinda, Indonesia
11 Feb 197568.9ResignedBishop of Samarinda, Indonesia
23 Sep 198680.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Samarinda, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Jacques Henri Romeijn:
Bishop Jacques Henri Romeijn M.S.F. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Samarinda

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015