Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelmus Marinus Bekkers

Deceased

Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1908BornS. Oedenrode
10 Jun 193325.1Ordained PriestPriest of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
19 Dec 195648.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
19 Dec 195648.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thasus
12 Feb 195748.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thasus
27 Jun 196052.2SucceededBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
9 May 196658.1DiedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Wilhelmus Marinus Bekkers:
Bishop Wilhelmus Marinus Bekkers (born , died ) Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013