Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Herman Jan van Elswijk, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Morogoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1905BornNaaldwijk, Netherlands
25 Jul 193328.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
18 Jul 195449.3AppointedBishop of Morogoro, Tanzania
28 Oct 195449.5Ordained BishopBishop of Morogoro, Tanzania
15 Dec 196661.7ResignedBishop of Morogoro, Tanzania
15 Dec 196661.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Elephantaris in Mauretania
13 Aug 197671.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Elephantaris in Mauretania
3 Nov 198782.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Morogoro, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Herman Jan van Elswijk:
Bishop Herman Jan van Elswijk C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Morogoro

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013