Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnold Frans Diepen

Deceased

Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1860Born’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)
7 Jun 188424.2Ordained PriestPriest of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
11 Feb 191554.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
11 Feb 191554.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Danaba
7 Mar 191555.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Danaba
24 Dec 191959.8SucceededBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
18 Mar 194383.0DiedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Arnold Frans Diepen:
Bishop Arnold Frans Diepen (born , died ) Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013