Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cornelius Bronsveld, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tabora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1905BornBussum, Netherlands
29 Jun 193025.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
31 May 195045.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tabora, Tanzania
31 May 195045.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Carallia
22 Aug 195045.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carallia
25 Mar 195348.1AppointedArchbishop of Tabora, Tanzania
21 Dec 195954.8ResignedArchbishop of Tabora, Tanzania
21 Dec 195954.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Leontopolis in Augustamnica
30 Nov 197065.8ResignedTitular Archbishop of Leontopolis in Augustamnica
14 Jan 198074.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tabora, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Bronsveld:
Archbishop Cornelius Bronsveld M. Afr. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tabora

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013