Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Vos, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kuching

Titular Bishop of Cnidus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1902BornAmsterdam, Netherlands
17 Jul 192725.3Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
18 Nov 194947.7AppointedPrefect of Sarawak, Malaysia
14 Feb 195249.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cnidus
14 Feb 195249.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kuching, Malaysia
12 Jun 195250.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cnidus
9 Feb 196865.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Kuching, Malaysia
29 Jun 197371.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kuching, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Jan Vos:
Bishop Jan Vos M.H.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kuching

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013