Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Groen, M.S.F. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bandjarmasin, Indonesia

Titular Bishop of Sbida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1891Born
17 Dec 192130.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
10 Mar 194957.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bandjarmasin, Indonesia
10 Mar 194957.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sbida
16 Jun 194957.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sbida
18 Apr 195361.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Bandjarmasin, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Joannes Groen
Bishop Joannes Groen M.S.F. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bandjarmasin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrosthuizen, Netherlands

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast