Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Willem van Kester, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Basankusu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1906BornKwintsheul, Netherlands
25 May 192923.3Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
19 Jun 195246.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Basankusu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Jun 195246.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Legia
11 Oct 195246.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Legia
10 Nov 195953.7AppointedBishop of Basankusu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Nov 197468.7ResignedBishop of Basankusu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
7 Apr 198983.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Basankusu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Willem van Kester:
Bishop Willem van Kester M.H.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Basankusu

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015