Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus Bares

Deceased

Bishop of Berlin, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1871Born
30 Mar 189524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
15 Jan 192957.9AppointedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
24 Feb 192958.0Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
12 Mar 192958.1InstalledBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
27 Oct 193362.7SelectedBishop of Berlin, Germany
21 Dec 193362.9ConfirmedBishop of Berlin, Germany
2 Feb 193463.0InstalledBishop of Berlin, Germany
1 Mar 193564.1DiedBishop of Berlin, Germany

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Bares
Bishop Nikolaus Bares (born , died ) Bishop of Berlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIdenheim

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast