Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Joseph Fischer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg

Titular Bishop of Zuri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1871BornAalen
16 Jul 189523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
19 Dec 192958.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg, Germany
19 Dec 192958.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Zuri
24 Feb 193058.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zuri
24 Jul 195886.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Joseph Fischer:
Bishop Franz Joseph Fischer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015