Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Mönch

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

Titular Bishop of Polystylus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1870BornNiederholzweiler
28 Oct 189727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
1 Jul 191545.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
1 Jul 191545.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Polystylus
21 Sep 191545.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Polystylus
15 Feb 193564.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anton Mönch:
Bishop Anton Mönch (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013