Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Hilfrich

Deceased

Bishop of Limburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1873Born
28 Oct 189825.0Ordained PriestPriest of Limburg, Germany
31 Mar 193056.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Limburg, Germany
31 Mar 193056.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
5 Jun 193056.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
30 Oct 193057.0SucceededBishop of Limburg, Germany
5 Feb 194773.3DiedBishop of Limburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anton Hilfrich
Bishop Anton Hilfrich (born , died ) Bishop of Limburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLindenholzhausen

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,565
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast