Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Vurum

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1763BornTrnava
17 Aug 178824.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Aug 178824.7Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 181652.5SelectedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
23 Sep 181652.8ConfirmedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
10 Nov 181653.0Ordained BishopBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
21 Dec 182158.1SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
19 Apr 182258.4ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
25 May 182763.5SelectedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
17 Sep 182763.8ConfirmedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
2 May 183874.4DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for József Vurum:
Bishop József Vurum (born , died ) Bishop of Nitra

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 64, and Page 285
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 389

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013