Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Zalka

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1820Born
11 Jan 184625.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Győr (Raab), Hungary
15 Jan 184625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Győr (Raab), Hungary
14 Feb 186746.1SelectedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
27 Mar 186746.2ConfirmedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
5 May 186746.3Ordained BishopBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
16 Jan 190180.0DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for János Zalka (VIAF: 121505330)
Bishop János Zalka (born , died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVeszkény, Diocese of Győr (Raab)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Győr, Diocese of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 317
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017