Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fűlöp (Philipp) Steiner

Deceased

Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1839Born
25 Jul 186324.2Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jan 189050.6SelectedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
26 Jun 189051.1ConfirmedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
8 Sep 189051.3Ordained BishopBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
11 Aug 190061.2DiedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Fűlöp (Philipp) Steiner (VIAF: 89576450)
Bishop Fűlöp (Philipp) Steiner (born , died ) Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFehéregyháza, Diocese of Győr (Raab)
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 85
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017