Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kornél Hidasy

Deceased

Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1828³Born
26 Jul 185123.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Jul 185123.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188354.7AppointedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
3 May 188354.8Ordained BishopBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
11 Oct 190072.3DiedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kornél Hidasy
Bishop Kornél Hidasy (born , died ) Bishop of Szombathely

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKomárom
Ordained BishopSzombathely, Diocese of Szombathely

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 490
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,659
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017