Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miklós Széchenyi de Salvar-Felsovidék

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1868BornSopron
7 May 189022.3Ordained PriestPriest of Győr (Raab), Hungary
1 Nov 190133.8SelectedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
16 Dec 190133.9ConfirmedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
2 Feb 190234.1Ordained BishopBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
20 Apr 191143.3AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
1 Dec 192355.9DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Miklós Széchenyi de Salvar-Felsovidék:
Bishop Miklós Széchenyi de Salvar-Felsovidék (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 317
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013