Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop František Lajčák, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1772BornSchemnitz
7 Apr 179522.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Dec 179523.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 182552.2SelectedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
27 Jun 182552.5ConfirmedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
21 Aug 182552.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
25 May 182754.4SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
17 Sep 182754.7ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
26 Jul 184269.6ResignedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
5 May 184370.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for František Lajčák:
Bishop František Lajčák O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 389, and Page 325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013