Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kálmán Kránitz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Cyme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1841Born
31 Jul 186322.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Veszprém, Hungary
1 Aug 186322.0Ordained PriestPriest of Veszprém, Hungary
18 Apr 190765.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary
18 Apr 190765.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyme
12 May 190765.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyme
12 Jul 193594.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Kálmán Kránitz
Bishop Kálmán Kránitz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Veszprém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZala-Apáti

  • a priest for 71.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,936
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 150
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,907, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast