Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ha Chi-shing, O.F.M.

Auxiliary Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

Titular Bishop of Simitthu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1959 Born
27 Aug 198829.4Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
9 Sep 199031.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 Jul 201455.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
11 Jul 201455.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Simitthu
30 Aug 201455.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simitthu

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ha Chi-shing
Bishop Joseph Ha Chi-shing O.F.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHong Kong

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hong Kong [Xianggang].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 Jul 2014
  • c34: CB, 30 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,282
  • c1: CB, 3 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast