Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Krautbauer

Deceased

Bishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1824Born
16 Jul 185026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
12 Feb 187551.0AppointedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
29 Jun 187551.4Ordained BishopBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
17 Dec 188561.9DiedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Krautbauer
Bishop Francis Xavier Krautbauer (born , died ) Bishop of Green Bay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMappach, Diocese of Regensburg, Germany
Ordained BishopSt. John Evangelist, Cathedral, Milwaukee, Archdiocese of Milwaukee, Wisconsin
Death PlaceGreen Bay, Diocese of Green Bay, Wisconsin

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 520
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017