Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kaspar (Balthasar) Willi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1823Born
1 May 184522.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
11 Jun 184825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Dec 186845.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chur, Switzerland
21 Dec 186845.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipatris
7 Mar 186946.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antipatris
10 Jan 187753.9SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
12 Mar 187754.1ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
1 Apr 187754.1InstalledBishop of Chur, Switzerland
17 Apr 187956.2DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Kaspar (Balthasar) Willi (VIAF: 304913845)
Bishop Kaspar (Balthasar) Willi O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDomat/Ems
Ordained BishopMaria Einsiedeln, Abbey, Einsideln

  • a priest for 30.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 110, and Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,869, Number 12
  • ~od/prof/c1: CB, 8 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast