Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Pius Miles, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nashville, Tennessee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1791BornPrince George's County, MD
13 May 181019.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Sep 181625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
28 Jul 183746.2AppointedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
16 Sep 183847.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
21 Feb 186068.8DiedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard Pius Miles:
Bishop Richard Pius Miles O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Nashville

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 276

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013