Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Edward Petit

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1895Born
9 May 191822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
8 Feb 194751.6AppointedBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
25 Mar 194751.7Ordained BishopBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
16 Jun 197276.9RetiredBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
3 Jun 197377.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Edward Petit
Bishop John Edward Petit (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Menevia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHighgate, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained PriestSt. Edmund, College, Old Hall Green, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady Star of the Sea, Church, Llandudno, Conwy, Diocese of Menevia, Wales
Death PlaceNazareth House, Wrexham, Wrexham, Diocese of Menevia, Wales
Buried Place (Original)St. David, Priory, Pantasaph, Holywell, Flintshire, Diocese of Menevia, Wales

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 18
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 167
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 8 Apr 2018