Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard William Tickle

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Great Britain, Military

Titular Bishop of Bela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1909Born
28 Oct 193424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
12 Oct 196353.9AppointedBishop of Great Britain, Military
12 Oct 196353.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bela
1 Dec 196354.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bela
24 Apr 197868.4ResignedBishop of Great Britain, Military
14 Sep 199484.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Great Britain, Military

MicroData Summary for Gerard William Tickle (VIAF: 258983122)
Bishop Gerard William Tickle (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Great Britain, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBirkenhead, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSisters of Mercy, Nursing Home, Colwyn, Conwy, Diocese of Wrexham, Wales
Buried Place (Original)St. Winefried, Cemetery, Neston, Wirral, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 195
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast