Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Ehrenfried

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1871Born
28 Oct 189827.2Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
30 Sep 192453.1AppointedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
1 Dec 192453.3Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
29 May 194876.8DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Matthias Ehrenfried (VIAF: 59878448)
Bishop Matthias Ehrenfried (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbsberg

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast