Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Victor Grahmann

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dallas, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1931Born
17 Mar 195624.6Ordained PriestPriest of San Antonio, Texas, USA
30 Jun 198149.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
30 Jun 198149.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Equilium
20 Aug 198150.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Equilium
13 Apr 198250.7AppointedBishop of Victoria in Texas, USA
29 May 198250.8InstalledBishop of Victoria in Texas, USA
9 Dec 198958.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
18 Dec 198958.4InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
14 Jul 199058.9SucceededBishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
6 Mar 200775.6RetiredBishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
14 Aug 201887.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Dallas, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Victor Grahmann
Bishop Charles Victor Grahmann (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dallas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHallettsville
Death PlaceSan Antonio, Archdiocese of San Antonio, Texas

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Mar 2007
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015
  • d: CB, 15 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 Aug 2018

Quantcast