Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmond Carmody

Bishop Emeritus of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1934 Born
8 Jun 195723.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Antonio, Texas, USA
8 Nov 198854.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
8 Nov 198854.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Murthlacum
15 Dec 198854.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Murthlacum
24 Mar 199258.1AppointedBishop of Tyler, Texas, USA
25 May 199258.3InstalledBishop of Tyler, Texas, USA
3 Feb 200066.0AppointedBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
17 Mar 200066.1InstalledBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
18 Jan 201076.0RetiredBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Edmond Carmody
Bishop Edmond Carmody (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Corpus Christi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAhalane, Ireland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Corpus Christi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,926
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast