Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vinzenz Guggenberger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg

Titular Bishop of Abziri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1929BornOsterham
29 Jun 195324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
17 May 197243.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
17 May 197243.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Abziri
24 Jun 197243.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abziri
22 Mar 200475.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
4 Jul 201283.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Vinzenz Guggenberger:
Bishop Vinzenz Guggenberger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Regensburg

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 4 Jul 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 May 2014