Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alois Stöger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Pölten

Titular Bishop of Aptuca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1904BornKautzen
6 Jul 193026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Pölten, Austria
3 Jul 196763.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
3 Jul 196763.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aptuca
15 Aug 196763.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aptuca
10 Nov 198682.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
12 Dec 199995.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Pölten, Austria

MicroData Summary for Alois Stöger:
Bishop Alois Stöger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Pölten

  • a priest for 69.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013