Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Hiltl

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Titular Bishop of Constantina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1889BornSchwandorf
29 Jun 191424.8Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
28 Apr 195161.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
28 Apr 195161.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantina
14 May 195161.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Constantina
20 Apr 197989.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Hiltl:
Bishop Josef Hiltl (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1980
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013