Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bernard Bernard, M.S. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Norvegia (Norway)

Priest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1821Born
5 Jul 184624.9Ordained PriestPriest
1862²40.4AppointedPrefect of Arctic Pole
1869²47.4AppointedPrefect of Norvegia (Norway)
188563.4ProfessedPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
1887²65.4ResignedPrefect of Norvegia (Norway)
28 Oct 189574.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Norvegia (Norway)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard Bernard
Father Bernard Bernard M.S. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Norvegia (Norway)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMogues, France
Ordained PriestReims, Archdiocese of Reims, France

  • a priest for 49.3 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 19 Jan 2019

Quantcast