Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Giacomo Baccini, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1869Born
25 Aug 190838.7AppointedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
4 Oct 190838.8Ordained BishopBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
16 Jan 193565.1DiedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Giacomo Baccini
Bishop Luigi Giacomo Baccini O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaggia

  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 55
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast