Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander MacDonald

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada

Titular Bishop of Hebron


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1858Born
8 Mar 188426.0Ordained PriestPriest of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
1 Oct 190850.6AppointedBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
3 Jan 190950.8Ordained BishopBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
6 Jun 192365.3ResignedBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
6 Jun 192365.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
24 Feb 194183.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Alexander MacDonald
Bishop Alexander MacDonald (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Victoria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMabou, Cap Breton

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast