Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anselm Edward John Kenealy, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Simla

Titular Archbishop of Ratiaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1864BornAbersychan, Great Britain
1887¹22.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Dec 191046.2AppointedArchbishop of Simla, India
1 Jan 191146.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Simla, India
13 Jan 193671.2ResignedArchbishop of Simla, India
13 Jan 193671.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ratiaria
18 Dec 194379.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Simla, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anselm Edward John Kenealy:
Archbishop Anselm Edward John Kenealy O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Simla

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013