Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Camassei

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1848BornRoma, Italy
12 Apr 187223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
18 Mar 190455.5AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
10 Apr 190455.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
6 Dec 190658.2AppointedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
15 Dec 191971.2Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 191971.2RetiredPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
18 Dec 191971.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
18 Jan 192172.3DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Filippo Camassei:
Filippo Cardinal Camassei (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
  • a cardinal for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014