Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Víctor Carabés Chávez, M.N.M.

Bishop-Elect of Tenancingo, México, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1963 Born
7 Sep 199027.1Perpetual VowsMember of Misioneros de la Natividad de María
8 Sep 199027.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Misioneros de la Natividad de María
2 Jul 199127.9Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros de la Natividad de María
3 Apr 202460.7AppointedBishop of Tenancingo, México, México
13 Jul 202461.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tenancingo, México, México

MicroData Summary for Víctor Carabés Chávez
(WikiData: Q125295931)
Father Víctor Carabés Chávez M.N.M. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Tenancingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained DeaconMisioneros de la Natividad de María, Seminary, León, Diocese of León, Guanajuato
Ordained PriestCathedral, León, Diocese of León, Guanajuato
Ordained BishopUniversidad de Tenancingo, Tenancingo, Diocese of Tenancingo, México

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Tenancingo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2024
  • ob/c1/perf: CB, 4 Apr 2024
  • ob.loc: AM, 30 Jun 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 8 Jul 2024