Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tarahumara

Dioecesis Tarahumarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 20 December 1993
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Chihuahua
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Chihuahua
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 31,353 (12,110 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Cascada s/n, Col. Altavista, Apartado 11, 33180 Guachochi, Chih., México
  • Telephone: (649)543-0710
  • Fax: 543-0882

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Tarahumara
6 May 1950ErectedDiocese of Chihuahua Mission "Sui Iuris" of Tarahumara (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tarahumara
23 June 1958ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Tarahumara Vicariate Apostolic of Tarahumara
Diocese of Tarahumara
20 December 1993ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Tarahumara Diocese of Tarahumara

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Tarahumara
1966121,600125,00097.3%19196,400351061ap1967
1970130,000133,61797.3%1919383,42126294ap1971
1976147,000150,00098.0%520255,8804083ap1977
1980154,000174,00088.5%1018285,5003792ap1981
1990160,000164,00097.6%1716334,84813213516ap1991
Diocese of Tarahumara
1999250,725253,45098.9%1421357,1633311114ap2000
2000261,700264,52098.9%1321347,6973411214ap2001
2001265,320270,81598.0%1322357,5803411414ap2002
2002267,815275,30097.3%1222347,8763510814ap2003
2003271,300280,80696.6%1420347,9793210614ap2004
2004275,600285,30096.6%1420348,1053210614ap2005
2010296,000306,00096.7%1922417,2193111415ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011