Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Miguel Cardinal Payá y Rico

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta

Patriarch of West Indies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1811BornBenejama
24 Sep 183624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
25 Jun 185846.5AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
12 Sep 185846.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Spain
16 Jan 187462.1AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
12 Mar 187765.2Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 187765.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
7 Jun 188674.5AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
7 Jun 188674.5AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
25 Dec 189180.0DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Payá y Rico:
Cardinal Miguel Payá y Rico (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
  • a cardinal for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1877
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 219, and Page 220
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 558, and Page 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013