Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro José Zarandia y Endara

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1783Born
17 Oct 184764.5SelectedBishop of Orense, Spain
17 Dec 184764.7AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
19 Mar 184864.9Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
12 Jun 185168.2SelectedBishop of Huesca, Spain
5 Sep 185168.4ConfirmedBishop of Huesca, Spain
24 Mar 186177.9DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro José Zarandia y Endara
Bishop Pedro José Zarandia y Endara (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLesaca, Diocese of Pamplona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pamplona, Diocese of Pamplona

  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 133, and Page 429
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 153, Number 838
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast