Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Ramón Arias Teijeiro de Castro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santander

Titular Bishop of Echinus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1780BornCabanelas
2 Jan 184867.6SelectedBishop of Santander, Spain
17 Jan 184867.7ConfirmedBishop of Santander, Spain
2 Jul 184868.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santander, Spain
20 Jul 185979.2RetiredBishop of Santander, Spain
13 Jul 186080.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Echinus
18 Dec 186383.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Santander, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Ramón Arias Teijeiro de Castro:
Bishop Manuel Ramón Arias Teijeiro de Castro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santander

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,499
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 256, and Page 500
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 155, Number 848

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015