Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Acquaviva d’Aragona

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1665BornNaples, Italy
2 Dec 169732.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
22 Dec 169732.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
6 Apr 170034.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
17 May 170640.5Elevated to Cardinal
7 Dec 170641.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
8 Jun 170741.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
28 Jan 170943.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
12 Jun 172458.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
9 Jan 172559.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

MicroData Summary for Francesco Acquaviva d’Aragona:
Francesco Cardinal Acquaviva d’Aragona (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
  • a cardinal for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015