Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Salvá y Munar

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1792Born
1816¹23.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 185159.1SelectedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
5 Sep 185159.6ConfirmedBishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain
1 Feb 185260.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain
4 Nov 187381.8DiedBishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Salvá y Munar (VIAF: 72264172)
Bishop Miguel Salvá y Munar (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca y Ibiza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlgaida
Ordained BishopSan Isidro el Real, Church, Madrid

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 360
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 160, Number 876
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,852, Number 3
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,553

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast